NE LB886 | 2015-2016 | 104th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 20 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-04-20 - Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Volunteer Emergency Responders Incentive Act and provide income tax credits
Title
Adopt the Volunteer Emergency Responders Incentive Act and provide income tax credits
Sponsors
Sen. Al Davis [N] |
Roll Calls
2016-04-12 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 (Y: 46 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-04-20 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 18, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2016 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 46-0-3 |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2016-04-12 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate withdrawn |
2016-04-07 | Legislature | Hadley motion to suspend rules and vote on final passage without further amendments, motions, or debate filed |
2016-04-04 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2016-04-01 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2016-03-29 | Legislature | Placed on Select File |
2016-03-23 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Morfeld name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Haar name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Gloor name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Garrett name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Ebke name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Larson name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Kolowski name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Hughes name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Harr name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Hansen name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Sullivan name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Smith name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Howard name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Groene name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Friesen name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Brasch name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Williams name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Stinner name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Seiler name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Schilz name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Scheer name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Mello name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Krist name added |
2016-03-09 | Legislature | Baker name added |
2016-03-03 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2016-02-19 | Legislature | Davis priority bill |
2016-01-28 | Legislature | Johnson name added |
2016-01-26 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 03, 2016 |
2016-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2016-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |