NE LB887 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 18 2012 - 100% progression
Action: 2012-04-18 - Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions relating to insurance
Title
Change provisions relating to insurance
Sponsors
Sen. Rich Pahls [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Approved by Governor on April 11, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | Presented to Governor on April 05, 2012 | |
2012-04-05 | President/Speaker signed | |
2012-04-05 | Passed on Final Reading 48-0-1 | |
2012-04-05 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on Final Reading | |
2012-02-24 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2012-02-24 | Enrollment and Review ER182 adopted | |
2012-02-16 | Enrollment and Review ER182 filed | |
2012-02-16 | Placed on Select File with ER182 | |
2012-02-14 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2012-02-14 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1764 adopted | |
2012-02-08 | McCoy name added | |
2012-02-01 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM1764 filed | |
2012-02-01 | Placed on General File with AM1764 | |
2012-01-17 | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2012 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Date of introduction |