NE LB899 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on August 11 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-08-11 - Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide certain powers for public power districts relating to fuels and fuel byproducts
Title
Provide certain powers for public power districts relating to fuels and fuel byproducts
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Hughes [N] |
Roll Calls
2020-07-31 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 1) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Legislature - Natural Resources AM2487 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 44 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2020-03-03 - Legislature - Natural Resources AM2487 adopted (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 4) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-11 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on August 06, 2020 |
2020-08-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on July 31, 2020 |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2020-07-31 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2020-07-22 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2020-07-20 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER190 adopted |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER190 filed |
2020-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER190 |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2020-03-04 | Legislature | Wayne MO160 withdrawn |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Wayne MO160 pending |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Wayne MO160 Recommit to Natural Resources Committee filed |
2020-03-03 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2487 adopted |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Natural Resources AM2487 filed |
2020-02-21 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2487 |
2020-02-18 | Legislature | Moser priority bill |
2020-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2020 |
2020-01-15 | Legislature | Kolterman name added |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Natural Resources Committee |
2020-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |