NE LB900 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB900 amended into LB1160 by AM2280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB900 amended into LB1160 by AM2280
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require a report concerning individuals in need of multiple division services from the Department of Health and Human Services
Title
Require a report concerning individuals in need of multiple division services from the Department of Health and Human Services
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB900 amended into LB1160 by AM2280 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-03-01 | Health and Human Services AM2169 filed | |
2012-03-01 | Placed on General File with AM2169 | |
2012-01-17 | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2012 | |
2012-01-11 | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee | |
2012-01-09 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15810 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB900.pdf |