NE LB900 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Nebraska Rules of the Road relating to the length of vehicles
Title
Change provisions of the Nebraska Rules of the Road relating to the length of vehicles
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brandt [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2024 |
2024-01-05 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |