NE LB908 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB908 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-18 - Provisions/portions of LB908 amended into LB909 by AM2312
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change provisions of the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act
Title
Change provisions of the Delayed Deposit Services Licensing Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-18 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB908 amended into LB909 by AM2312 |
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-06 | Legislature | Placed on General File |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2020 |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee |
2020-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40667 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB908.pdf |