NE LB920 | 2011-2012 | 102nd Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB920 amended into LB310 by AM2259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-04-18 - Provisions/Portions of LB920 amended into LB310 by AM2259
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change harassment protection order and domestic abuse protection order provisions
Title
Change harassment protection order and domestic abuse protection order provisions
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-04-18 | Provisions/Portions of LB920 amended into LB310 by AM2259 | |
2012-04-18 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2012-02-28 | Judiciary AM2097 filed | |
2012-02-28 | Placed on General File with AM2097 | |
2012-01-18 | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2012 | |
2012-01-12 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2012-01-10 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=15686 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/Current/PDF/Intro/LB920.pdf |