NE LB923 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB923 amended into LB800 by AM2109
Status: Introduced on January 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB923 amended into LB800 by AM2109
Summary
Change provisions relating to sealing of juvenile criminal justice records
Title
Change provisions relating to sealing of juvenile criminal justice records
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB923 amended into LB800 by AM2109 | |
2010-04-14 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-20 | Notice of hearing for January 27, 2010 | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=10009 |