NE LB931 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB818 amended into LB931 by AM2047
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-04-14 - Provisions/portions of LB818 amended into LB931 by AM2047
Summary
Change and eliminate provisions of the Real Property Appraiser Act and the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Title
Change and eliminate provisions of the Real Property Appraiser Act and the Nebraska Real Estate License Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-04-14 | Provisions/portions of LB818 amended into LB931 by AM2047 | |
2010-04-14 | Approved by Governor on April 14, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Presented to Governor on April 12, 2010 | |
2010-04-12 | President/Speaker signed | |
2010-04-12 | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 45-4-0 | |
2010-04-12 | Dispensing of reading at large approved | |
2010-04-08 | Placed on Final Reading with ST9106 | |
2010-04-07 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment | |
2010-04-07 | Enrollment and Review ER8224 adopted | |
2010-03-30 | Enrollment and Review ER8224 filed | |
2010-03-30 | Placed on Select File with ER8224 | |
2010-03-29 | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial | |
2010-03-29 | Harms AM2411 adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Harms AM2411 filed | |
2010-03-29 | Sullivan AM2248 adopted | |
2010-03-29 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2047 adopted | |
2010-03-23 | Sullivan AM2248 filed | |
2010-03-02 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance AM2047 filed | |
2010-03-02 | Placed on General File with AM2047 | |
2010-02-24 | Langemeier name withdrawn | |
2010-02-24 | Utter name added | |
2010-02-24 | Sullivan name added | |
2010-02-17 | Banking, Commerce and Insurance priority bill | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 09, 2010 | |
2010-01-19 | Referred to Banking, Commerce and Insurance Committee | |
2010-01-13 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9709 |