NE LB934 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB934 amended into LB931 by AM1849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB934 amended into LB931 by AM1849
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require identification prior to receipt of dispensed opiates
Title
Require identification prior to receipt of dispensed opiates
Sponsors
Sen. John Kuehn [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB934 amended into LB931 by AM1849 |
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Judiciary AM1841 filed |
2018-02-12 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1841 |
2018-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34091 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB934.pdf |