NE LB935 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on February 28 2018 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorize the inspection of certain tax return information and change application, reporting, and record retention provisions under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Title
Authorize the inspection of certain tax return information and change application, reporting, and record retention provisions under the Nebraska Advantage Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-03-29 | Legislature | Kuehn AM2757 filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER115 filed |
2018-03-06 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER115 |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1888 adopted |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Kuehn FA111 adopted |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Kuehn FA111 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Harr FA110 adopted |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Chambers MO236 withdrawn |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Chambers MO236 Bracket until April 4, 2018 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Harr FA110 pending |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Harr FA110 pending |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Harr FA110 filed |
2018-02-28 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1888 pending |
2018-02-15 | Legislature | Legislative Performance Audit priority bill |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Executive Board AM1888 filed |
2018-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1888 |
2018-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 24, 2018 |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34224 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LB935.pdf |