NE LB937 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 25 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-25 - Approved by Governor on April 23, 2024
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide for tax credits, tax exemptions, and certain grant programs and change provisions relating to tax credits and fuel taxes
Title
Provide for tax credits, tax exemptions, and certain grant programs and change provisions relating to tax credits and fuel taxes
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-04-18 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 (Y: 45 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - Bostar AM3420 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Revenue AM3206 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, J. AM3116 adopted (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Brandt AM3260 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Revenue AM3205 adopted (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Bostar AM3187 lost (Y: 17 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
2024-04-10 - Legislature - Bostar AM3420 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 13 Abs: 2) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial (Y: 40 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Revenue AM3206 adopted (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Cavanaugh, J. AM3116 adopted (Y: 31 N: 4 NV: 9 Abs: 5) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Brandt AM3260 adopted (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 6) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Revenue AM3205 adopted (Y: 28 N: 15 NV: 2 Abs: 4) [PASS]
2024-03-28 - Legislature - Bostar AM3187 lost (Y: 17 N: 24 NV: 3 Abs: 5) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-25 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 23, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 18, 2024 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading 45-0-4 |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1405 withdrawn |
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1397 withdrawn |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | McDonnell name added |
2024-04-11 | Legislature | Vargas name added |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Wayne AM3287 withdrawn |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Bostar AM3420 adopted |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Bostar AM3420 to ER115 filed |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Linehan MO1345 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Linehan MO1347 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Linehan MO1346 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1404 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1403 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1402 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1394 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1395 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1396 not considered |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1260 withdrawn |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1256 withdrawn |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1257 withdrawn |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1258 withdrawn |
2024-04-10 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER115 adopted |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1405 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1404 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1403 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1402 Bracket until April 18, 2024 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1397 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1396 Bracket until April 18, 2024 filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1395 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2024-04-09 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1394 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-04-05 | Legislature | Wayne AM3287 to ER115 filed |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Linehan MO1347 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Linehan MO1346 Bracket until April 18, 2024 filed |
2024-04-03 | Legislature | Linehan MO1345 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER115 filed |
2024-04-02 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER115 |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM3001 not considered |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM3206 adopted |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. AM3116 adopted |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, J. AM3116 to AM3132 filed |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Brandt AM3260 adopted |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1259 withdrawn |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM3205 adopted |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Bostar AM3187 lost |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM3206 filed |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM3205 filed |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Revenue AM3132 divided |
2024-03-28 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1261 withdrawn |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Brandt AM3260 to AM3132 filed |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Bostar AM3187 to AM3132 filed |
2024-03-27 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1261 pending |
2024-03-20 | Legislature | Corrected Revenue AM3132 filed |
2024-03-19 | Legislature | Revenue AM3001 filed |
2024-03-19 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM3001 |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1261 Indefinitely postpone pursuant to Rule 6, Sec. 3(f) filed |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1260 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1259 Bracket until April 11, 2024 filed |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1258 Bracket until April 12, 2024 filed |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1257 Recommit to the Revenue Committee filed |
2024-03-14 | Legislature | Cavanaugh, M. MO1256 Indefinitely postpone filed |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Day name added |
2024-03-04 | Legislature | Sanders name added |
2024-02-15 | Legislature | Bostar priority bill |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 25, 2024 |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Revenue Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Date of introduction |