NE LB944 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1062 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-04-23 - Provisions/portions of LB1062 amended into LB944 by AM1699
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations and reduce appropriations
Title
Provide, change, and eliminate provisions relating to appropriations and reduce appropriations
Sponsors
Sen. Jim Scheer [N] |
Roll Calls
2018-04-03 - Legislature - Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-6-5 (Y: 38 N: 6 NV: 3 Abs: 2) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1062 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB1055 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB864 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB802 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-23 | Legislature | Provisions/portions of LB674 amended into LB944 by AM1699 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Approved by Governor on April 04, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Presented to Governor on April 03, 2018 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | President/Speaker signed |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Passed on Final Reading with Emergency Clause 38-6-5 |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Dispensing of reading at large approved |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Chambers MO306 withdrawn |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Morfeld MO309 withdrawn |
2018-04-03 | Legislature | Morfeld MO309 Recommit to Appropriations Committee filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Placed on Final Reading with ST50 |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Chambers FA142 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Chambers MO306 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review for Engrossment |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Stinner MO307 prevailed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Stinner MO307 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Scheer AM2750 adopted |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Scheer AM2750 pending |
2018-03-28 | Legislature | Scheer AM2750 filed |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Stinner MO295 failed |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Stinner MO295 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2346 pending |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2346 pending |
2018-03-23 | Legislature | Wishart AM2514 withdrawn |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Stinner MO279 failed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Stinner MO279 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Wishart AM2514 pending |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Wishart AM2514 pending |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Erdman AM2405 lost |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Erdman AM2405 pending |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Krist AM2289 adopted |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Stinner AM2464 adopted |
2018-03-21 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER129 adopted |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Speaker Major Proposal |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Wishart AM2515 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Wishart AM2514 filed |
2018-03-20 | Legislature | Stinner AM2464 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Enrollment and Review ER129 filed |
2018-03-14 | Legislature | Placed on Select File with ER129 |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers MO260 Recommit to Appropriations Committee filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA117 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Chambers FA116 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Bolz AM2410 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Bolz AM2408 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Schumacher AM2356 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Erdman AM2407 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Erdman AM2405 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Pansing Brooks AM2346 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Advanced to Enrollment and Review Initial |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1699 adopted |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Stinner MO261 prevailed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Stinner MO261 Invoke cloture filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Bolz AM2274 withdrawn |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Morfeld MO259 withdrawn |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Morfeld MO259 pending |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Morfeld MO259 Bracket until April 18, 2018 filed |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Bolz AM2274 pending |
2018-03-13 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1699 pending |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Krist AM2289 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Appropriations AM1699 filed |
2018-03-09 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM1699 |
2018-03-08 | Legislature | Bolz AM2274 filed |
2018-01-22 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2018, on Section 71 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 22, 2018 |
2018-01-11 | Legislature | Referred to Appropriations Committee |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |