NE LB961 | 2019-2020 | 106th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-08-13 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Adopt the Peer-to-Peer Vehicle Sharing Program Act
Title
Adopt the Peer-to-Peer Vehicle Sharing Program Act
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-08-13 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Transportation and Telecommunications AM2324 filed |
2020-02-13 | Legislature | Placed on General File with AM2324 |
2020-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 28, 2020 |
2020-01-14 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2020-01-13 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=40987 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/106/PDF/Intro/LB961.pdf |