NE LB965 | 2021-2022 | 107th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2022-04-20 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Change the day the state observes Arbor Day
Title
Change the day the state observes Arbor Day
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-04-20 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2022-02-15 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 24, 2022 |
2022-01-12 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2022-01-11 | Legislature | Date of introduction |