NE LR142 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Notice of hearing for September 29, 2023
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 10 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-25 - Notice of hearing for September 29, 2023
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine Nebraska's policies relating to veterans and the competitiveness of Nebraska for veterans and current service members when choosing where to live after retirement
Title
Interim study to examine Nebraska's policies relating to veterans and the competitiveness of Nebraska for veterans and current service members when choosing where to live after retirement
Sponsors
Sen. Jen Day [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-25 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 29, 2023 |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2023-05-10 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-10 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=53797 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR142.pdf |