NE LR178 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Notice of hearing for October 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 16 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-10-24 - Notice of hearing for October 27, 2023
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to create a Select Committee to examine the feasibility of constructing and operating small modular nuclear reactors to generate electric power in Nebraska
Title
Interim study to create a Select Committee to examine the feasibility of constructing and operating small modular nuclear reactors to generate electric power in Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Tom Brewer [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-10-24 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for October 27, 2023 |
2023-06-01 | Legislature | Executive Board Report |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-16 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=53802 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR178.pdf |