NE LR184 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Notice of hearing for December 06, 2023
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-09-21 - Notice of hearing for December 06, 2023
Pending: Legislature Transportation and Telecommunications Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the deployment of broadband services within the State of Nebraska
Title
Interim study to examine the deployment of broadband services within the State of Nebraska
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Moser [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-09-21 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for December 06, 2023 |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to Transportation and Telecommunications Committee |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=53844 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR184.pdf |