NE LR202 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Notice of hearing for September 20, 2023
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 17 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-08-29 - Notice of hearing for September 20, 2023
Pending: Legislature Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to examine the mental and behavioral health care needs of Nebraskans
Title
Interim study to examine the mental and behavioral health care needs of Nebraskans
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-08-29 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 20, 2023 |
2023-05-23 | Legislature | Referred to Health and Human Services Committee |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2023-05-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=54120 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/108/PDF/Intro/LR202.pdf |