NE LR270CA | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 8 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to reduce the minimum age in the constitutional requirement to provide free instruction
Title
Constitutional amendment to reduce the minimum age in the constitutional requirement to provide free instruction
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-10 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 23, 2018 |
2018-01-09 | Legislature | Referred to Education Committee |
2018-01-08 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=34024 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR270CA.pdf |