NE LR271CA | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Indefinitely postponed
Status: Introduced on January 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-02-10 - Indefinitely postponed
Summary
Constitutional amendment to permit exemption of increased value resulting from home improvements
Title
Constitutional amendment to permit exemption of increased value resulting from home improvements
Sponsors
Sen. John Nelson [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-02-10 | Indefinitely postponed | |
2010-01-26 | Notice of hearing for February 05, 2010 | |
2010-01-08 | Referred to Revenue Committee | |
2010-01-07 | Pirsch name withdrawn | |
2010-01-07 | Nelson name added | |
2010-01-06 | Referred to Reference Committee | |
2010-01-06 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=9690 |