NE LR276 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Notice of hearing for January 26, 2024
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 3 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-01-16 - Notice of hearing for January 26, 2024
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge Congress to change the boundary of the Central Time Zone in Nebraska
Title
Urge Congress to change the boundary of the Central Time Zone in Nebraska
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for January 26, 2024 |
2024-01-08 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2024-01-04 | Legislature | Referred to Reference Committee |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Laid over |
2024-01-03 | Legislature | Date of introduction |