NE LR280CA | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 18 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Constitutional amendment to remove the Attorney General and the Secretary of State from the Board of Pardons
Title
Constitutional amendment to remove the Attorney General and the Secretary of State from the Board of Pardons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 08, 2024 |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Referred to Judiciary Committee |
2024-01-16 | Legislature | Date of introduction |