NE LR282 | 2023-2024 | 108th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 17 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-13 - Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024
Pending: Legislature Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Application to Congress for a convention of the states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to set a limit on the number of terms members of the House and Senate may serve
Title
Application to Congress for a convention of the states to propose an amendment to the United States Constitution to set a limit on the number of terms members of the House and Senate may serve
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-13 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for February 21, 2024 |
2024-02-01 | Legislature | Slama name added |
2024-01-18 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2024-01-17 | Legislature | Date of introduction |