NE LR319 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-05 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2018
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 22 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-07-05 - Notice of hearing for September 25, 2018
Pending: Legislature Urban Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Interim study to determine a sustainable revenue source for the Nebraska Main Street Network
Title
Interim study to determine a sustainable revenue source for the Nebraska Main Street Network
Sponsors
Sen. Dan Quick [N] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-05 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for September 25, 2018 |
2018-04-04 | Legislature | Referred to Urban Affairs Committee |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Referred to Executive Board |
2018-02-22 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=35001 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR319.pdf |