NE LR571 | 2009-2010 | 101st Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Committee Bill
Status: Introduced on April 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-01 - Notice of hearing for November 09, 2010
Status: Introduced on April 13 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-09-01 - Notice of hearing for November 09, 2010
Summary
Interim study to examine the implementation of LB63, 2009, with respect to creation of the Office of Violence Prevention, and to study implementation of LB800, 2010
Title
Interim study to examine the implementation of LB63, 2009, with respect to creation of the Office of Violence Prevention, and to study implementation of LB800, 2010
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-09-01 | Notice of hearing for November 09, 2010 | |
2010-08-30 | Notice of hearing for October 29, 2010 | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Judiciary Committee | |
2010-04-13 | Referred to Executive Board | |
2010-04-13 | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=11610 |