NE LR71 | 2017-2018 | 105th Legislature
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Nonpartisan 1-0)
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 15 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-04-18 - Indefinitely postponed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Urge United States Secretary of Homeland Security John Kelly to remove the designation of state election systems as critical infrastructure
Title
Urge United States Secretary of Homeland Security John Kelly to remove the designation of state election systems as critical infrastructure
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-18 | Legislature | Indefinitely postponed |
2018-01-03 | Legislature | Title printed. Carryover resolution |
2017-05-08 | Legislature | Notice of hearing for May 15, 2017 |
2017-03-21 | Legislature | Referred to Government, Military and Veterans Affairs Committee |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Speaker's announcement |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Laid over |
2017-03-15 | Legislature | Date of introduction |
Nebraska State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/bills/view_bill.php?DocumentID=32527 |
Text | https://nebraskalegislature.gov/FloorDocs/105/PDF/Intro/LR71.pdf |