NJ A1032 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5746
Note: Carry Over of previous S4245
Note: Carry Over of previous S4245
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S758 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S758 (3R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Reopens Workers Compensation Judges Part of PERS and requires Workers' Compensation Judges to be enrolled in PERS.
Title
Reopens Workers Compensation Judges Part of PERS and requires Workers' Compensation Judges to be enrolled in PERS.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-03-17 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-15 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 4 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S758 (3R) |
2021-06-03 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-05-20 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-03-17 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-03-15 | Assembly | Reported out of Asm. Comm. with Amendments, and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5746 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee
S758 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.140.
S4245 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee
S758 (Same As) 2021-06-30 - Approved P.L.2021, c.140.
S4245 (Carry Over) 2019-11-18 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate State Government, Wagering, Tourism & Historic Preservation Committee