NJ A1053 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session

Note: Carryover of previous A4846

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-1)
Status: Passed on October 4 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-10-04 - Approved P.L.2018, c.121.
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [HTML]

Summary

Revises and expands laws on trespass and vandalism on agricultural and horticultural lands.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Revises and expands laws on trespass and vandalism on agricultural and horticultural lands.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2018-09-27 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 79 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-09-27 - Senate - Senate Floor: Concur Governor Recommendations (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Substitute for S1429 (Voice Vote) (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-25 - Senate - Senate Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 39 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-05-31 - Senate - Senate Economic Growth Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-15 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-02-01 - Assembly - Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2018-10-04SenateApproved P.L.2018, c.121.
2018-09-27SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (38-0)
2018-09-27SenateReceived in the Senate, 2nd Reading - Concur. w/Gov's Recom.
2018-09-27AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (79-0-0)
2018-08-27Assembly2nd Reading in the Assembly on Concur. w/Gov.'s Recommend.
2018-08-27AssemblyFirst Reading/Governor Recommendations Only
2018-08-27AssemblyConditional Veto, Received in the Assembly
2018-06-25SenatePassed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (39-0)
2018-06-25SenateSubstituted for S1429
2018-05-31SenateReported from Senate Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-02-22SenateReceived in the Senate, Referred to Senate Economic Growth Committee
2018-02-15AssemblyPassed by the Assembly (70-0-1)
2018-02-01AssemblyReported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading
2018-01-09AssemblyIntroduced, Referred to Assembly Agriculture and Natural Resources Committee

Same As/Similar To

A4846 (Carry Over) 2018-01-08 - Passed Assembly (Passed Both Houses) (67-0-0)
S1429 (Same As) 2018-06-25 - Substituted by A1053

Subjects


New Jersey State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback