NJ A1097 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S1598 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 10 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-01-13 - Substituted by S1598 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits attending advanced practice nurse to determine cause of death and execute death certificate of patient if nurse is patient's primary care giver.*
Title
Permits attending advanced practice nurse to determine cause of death and execute death certificate of patient if nurse is patient's primary care giver.*
Sponsors
Rep. Annette Quijano [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Rep. Nancy Munoz [R] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Gabriela Mosquera [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S1598 (1R) |
2014-01-09 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2014-01-06 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Budget Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1598 (Same As) 2014-01-21 - Pocket Veto - Bills not Acted on by Governor-end of Session
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2012/A1097 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1500/1097_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2012/A1500/1097_R1.HTM |