NJ A1177 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S1893
Note: Carry Over of previous A2869
Note: Carry Over of previous A2869
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on October 29 2018 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Repeals law that established optional will registry.
Title
Repeals law that established optional will registry.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-10-29 - Assembly - Assembly Floor: Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 77 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-10-18 - Assembly - Assembly Judiciary Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-12-03 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2018-10-29 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (77-0-0) |
2018-10-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1177 (Carry Over) 2018-12-03 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2869 (Carry Over) 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3584 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
A2869 (Carry Over) 2016-09-26 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee
S3584 (Same As) 2019-03-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Judiciary Committee