NJ A1203 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A4942
Note: Carry Over of previous S3327
Note: Carry Over of previous S3327
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2024 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-02-22 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
"Pet Insurance Act."
Title
"Pet Insurance Act."
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-02-22 - Assembly - Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 13 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-02-22 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Financial Institutions and Insurance Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A4942 (Carry Over) 2023-11-27 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
S3327 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2034 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee
S3327 (Carry Over) 2023-02-16 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S2034 (Same As) 2024-01-09 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Commerce Committee