NJ A1204 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A484
Note: Carry Foward to future S642
Note: Carry Over of previous A1549
Note: Carry Over of previous A5065
Note: Carry Over of previous S3645
Note: Carry Foward to future S642
Note: Carry Over of previous A1549
Note: Carry Over of previous A5065
Note: Carry Over of previous S3645
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Pending: Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes NJ Historical Commission to establish program to promote developing historic projects on website and collect donations for projects on behalf of historic site or organization.
Title
Authorizes NJ Historical Commission to establish program to promote developing historic projects on website and collect donations for projects on behalf of historic site or organization.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-01-11 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A1204 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A1204 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A1549 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S3503 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5065 (Carry Over) 2020-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3645 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A1204 (Carry Over) 2022-01-11 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
A1549 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Tourism, Gaming and the Arts Committee
S3503 (Same As) 2023-02-28 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
A5065 (Carry Over) 2020-12-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S3645 (Carry Over) 2021-04-19 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2022/A1204 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2022/A1500/1204_I1.HTM |