NJ A1295 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A6060
Note: Carry Over of previous S4318
Note: Carry Over of previous S4318
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Pending: Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires DOC and DHS to pre-enroll inmates in Medicaid; establishes Medicaid enrollment course for inmates within DOC.
Title
Requires DOC and DHS to pre-enroll inmates in Medicaid; establishes Medicaid enrollment course for inmates within DOC.
Sponsors
Rep. Louis Greenwald [D] | Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Shanique Speight [D] | Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] |
Rep. Carol Murphy [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A6060 (Carry Over) 2019-12-05 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
S371 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4318 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
S371 (Same As) 2020-01-27 - Referred to Senate Budget and Appropriations Committee
S4318 (Carry Over) 2019-12-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Health, Human Services and Senior Citizens Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A1295 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A1500/1295_I1.HTM |