NJ A1549 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on June 20 2013 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2013-06-20 - Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school districts to take all steps to ensure adequate security for students when school is open as a polling place and provides that school district costs shall be deducted from the itemized list of expenses submitted by the county board of elections.
Title
Requires school districts to take all steps to ensure adequate security for students when school is open as a polling place and provides that school district costs shall be deducted from the itemized list of expenses submitted by the county board of elections.
Sponsors
Rep. John Wisniewski [D] | Rep. Vincent Prieto [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] | Rep. Angelica Jimenez [D] |
Sen. Patrick Diegnan [D] | Rep. Craig Coughlin [D] | Rep. Concetta Wagner [D] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] |
Roll Calls
2013-06-20 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-20 | Senate | Received in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (75-0-0) |
2013-06-06 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2013-05-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2012-01-10 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |