NJ A1633 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-4)
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 15 2011 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes the court to include provisions for animals in domestic violence restraining orders.*
Title
Authorizes the court to include provisions for animals in domestic violence restraining orders.*
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-12-15 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 71 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-12-15 | Passed by the Assembly (71-0-0) | |
2011-12-05 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Wagner) | |
2011-05-05 | Reported from Assembly Comm. as a Substitute, 2nd Reading | |
2010-01-12 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S540 (Same As) 2011-12-15 - Senate Amendment (38-0) (Kean, T.)