NJ A1662 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A3913
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 16-0)
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1784 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 9 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-03-25 - Substituted by S1784 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Provides Medicaid coverage for doula care.
Title
Provides Medicaid coverage for doula care.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-03-18 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 6 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-01-22 - Assembly - Assembly Women and Children Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 4 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-25 | Assembly | Substituted by S1784 (1R) |
2019-03-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2019-01-24 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Women and Children Committee |
2018-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A3913 (Carry Over) 2016-06-20 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Health and Senior Services Committee
S1784 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.85.
S1784 (Same As) 2019-05-08 - Approved P.L.2019, c.85.