NJ A2082 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S459
Note: Carry Over of previous A4281
Note: Carry Over of previous S2790
Note: Carry Over of previous A4281
Note: Carry Over of previous S2790
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 7-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Pending: Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires school bus driver's complete motor vehicle driving record be shared with board of education or school bus contractor and local police.
Title
Requires school bus driver's complete motor vehicle driving record be shared with board of education or school bus contractor and local police.
Sponsors
Rep. Lisa Swain [D] | Rep. Christopher Tully [D] | Rep. Daniel Benson [D] | Rep. Wayne DeAngelo [D] |
Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. Clinton Calabrese [D] | Rep. Pedro Mejia [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2082 (Carry Over) 2020-01-14 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
A4281 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S485 (Same As) 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2790 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
A4281 (Carry Over) 2018-06-27 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S485 (Same As) 2020-07-02 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Transportation and Independent Authorities Committee
S2790 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Transportation Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2082 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2082_I1.HTM |