NJ A2103 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5722
Note: Carry Over of previous S4041
Note: Carry Over of previous S4041
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S1010 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on January 14 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-06-24 - Substituted by S1010 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Permits counties and municipalities to bond for alternative fuel vehicles.
Title
Permits counties and municipalities to bond for alternative fuel vehicles.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-06-16 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 8 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-24 | Assembly | Substituted by S1010 (1R) |
2021-06-21 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Johnson) |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2021-06-16 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-01-14 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5722 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly State and Local Government Committee
S1010 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.267.
S4041 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S1010 (Same As) 2021-11-08 - Approved P.L.2021, c.267.
S4041 (Carry Over) 2019-08-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee