NJ A2215 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 40-1)
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Lost in the Assembly AVOR (44-32-0) (McKeon)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Vetoed on February 22 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-03-03 - Lost in the Assembly AVOR (44-32-0) (McKeon)
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Permits developer to qualify for low-interest loan from NJEDA when building a high performance green building.
Title
Permits developer to qualify for low-interest loan from NJEDA when building a high performance green building.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-03 - Assembly - Assembly Veto Override (Y: 44 N: 32 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Senate - Senate Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 36 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-01-10 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 75 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-03 | Lost in the Assembly AVOR (44-32-0) (McKeon) | |
2011-02-22 | Absolute Veto, Received in the Assembly | |
2011-01-10 | Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (37-0) | |
2011-01-10 | Substituted for S2558/2567 (SCS) | |
2011-01-10 | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading | |
2011-01-10 | Passed by the Assembly (75-2-1) | |
2010-11-08 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-11 | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Commerce and Economic Development Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S2558 (Same As) 2011-01-10 - Substituted by A2215