NJ A2258 | 2012-2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 23-11)
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Engrossed on December 19 2013 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-12-19 - Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Revises law concerning ticket sales.
Title
Revises law concerning ticket sales.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-12-19 - Assembly - Assembly Third Reading - Final Passage (Y: 67 N: 2 NV: 11 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-12-19 | Senate | Received in the Senate without Reference, 2nd Reading |
2013-12-19 | Assembly | Passed by the Assembly (67-2-6) |
2013-06-20 | Assembly | Assembly Substitution (Prieto) |
2012-10-18 | Assembly | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (Prieto) |
2012-06-18 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2012-02-02 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Regulated Professions Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S875 (Same As) 2013-06-20 - Senate Substitution (30-0) (Lesniak)