NJ A2350 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A665
Note: Carry Foward to future S1166
Note: Carry Over of previous S3332
Note: Carry Over of previous A1988
Note: Carry Foward to future S1166
Note: Carry Over of previous S3332
Note: Carry Over of previous A1988
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S914 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S914 (SCS)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Establishes program allowing certain applicants to perform community service in lieu of paying motor vehicle surcharges.
Title
Establishes program allowing certain applicants to perform community service in lieu of paying motor vehicle surcharges.
Sponsors
Rep. Anthony Verrelli [D] | Rep. Valerie Huttle [D] | Rep. Joann Downey [D] | Rep. William Moen [D] |
Rep. Annette Chaparro [D] | Rep. Mila Jasey [D] |
Roll Calls
2021-12-13 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 10 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-12-20 | Assembly | Substituted by S914 (SCS) |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2021-12-13 | Assembly | Transferred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2350 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S914 (SCS)
A2350 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S914 (SCS)
S914 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S3332 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1988 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A2350 (Carry Over) 2021-12-20 - Substituted by S914 (SCS)
S914 (Same As) 2022-01-10 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
S3332 (Carry Over) 2020-01-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee
A1988 (Carry Over) 2018-01-09 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee