NJ A2359 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future S567
Note: Carry Foward to future A2988
Note: Carry Over of previous A4245
Note: Carry Over of previous S2825
Note: Carry Foward to future A2988
Note: Carry Over of previous A4245
Note: Carry Over of previous S2825
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 3 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
Pending: Assembly Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Provides supplemental appropriation to DOE to provide additional State aid to certain school districts.
Title
Provides supplemental appropriation to DOE to provide additional State aid to certain school districts.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-03 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2359 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
A2359 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S675 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4245 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2825 (Carry Over) 2018-07-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A2359 (Carry Over) 2020-02-03 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S675 (Same As) 2020-01-14 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
A4245 (Carry Over) 2018-06-25 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Education Committee
S2825 (Carry Over) 2018-07-23 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Education Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2359 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A2500/2359_I1.HTM |