NJ A2365 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous S377
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 13-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1146 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2020-01-13 - Substituted by S1146 (1R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Requires hospital patient's medical record to include notation if patient is at increased risk of confusion, agitation, behavioral problems, and wandering due to dementia related disorder.
Title
Requires hospital patient's medical record to include notation if patient is at increased risk of confusion, agitation, behavioral problems, and wandering due to dementia related disorder.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2018-05-10 - Assembly - Assembly Human Services Committee: Reported with Amendments (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-01-13 | Assembly | Substituted by S1146 (1R) |
2018-05-10 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Human Services Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1146 (Same As) 2020-01-21 - Approved P.L.2019, c.392.
S377 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)
S377 (Carry Over) 2018-01-05 - Passed Senate (Passed Both Houses) (33-0)