NJ A2370 | 2018-2019 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A5031
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 9-4)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-05-23 - Substituted by S1216
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Requires AG to conduct survey of untested sexual assault examination kits.
Title
Requires AG to conduct survey of untested sexual assault examination kits.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-05-20 - Assembly - Assembly Appropriations Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-12-03 - Assembly - Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-23 | Assembly | Substituted by S1216 |
2019-05-20 | Assembly | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading |
2018-12-03 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2018-02-01 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Law and Public Safety Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A5031 (Carry Over) 2017-11-30 - Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S1216 (Same As) 2019-07-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.168.
S1216 (Same As) 2019-07-17 - Approved P.L.2019, c.168.