NJ A2558 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeCroce)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on March 16 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-12-15 - Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeCroce)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Enhances crime victims' rights under the "Crime Victim's Bill of Rights."
Title
Enhances crime victims' rights under the "Crime Victim's Bill of Rights."
Sponsors
Rep. Nelson Albano [D] | Rep. Gary Chiusano [R] | Rep. Alex DeCroce [R] | Sen. Linda Greenstein [D] |
Rep. Alison McHose [R] | Rep. Celeste Riley [D] | Rep. Robert Schroeder [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-12-15 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (DeCroce) | |
2011-11-28 | Reported out of Assembly Committee, 2nd Reading | |
2010-03-16 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Judiciary Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S371 (Same As) 2010-01-12 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Law and Public Safety Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A2558 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2558_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2558_R1.HTM |