NJ A2592 | 2020-2021 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A5277
Note: Carry Foward to future S3738
Note: Carry Over of previous A2613
Note: Carry Over of previous S3461
Note: Carry Foward to future S3738
Note: Carry Over of previous A2613
Note: Carry Over of previous S3461
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 13 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
Pending: Assembly Housing Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Clarifies scope of affordable housing obligations.
Title
Clarifies scope of affordable housing obligations.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-02-13 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2592 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2592 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2613 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1988 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3461 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
A2592 (Carry Over) 2020-02-13 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2613 (Carry Over) 2018-02-01 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee
S1988 (Same As) 2020-03-05 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3461 (Carry Over) 2019-02-07 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2020/A2592 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2020/A3000/2592_I1.HTM |