NJ A2606 | 2010-2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Substituted by S1856 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on May 6 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-14 - Substituted by S1856 (2R)
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [HTML]
Summary
Authorizes Ocean County Planning Board and municipal planning boards in Ocean County to take certain measures to control stormwater runoff and nonpoint source pollution in Barnegat Bay watershed. *
Title
Authorizes Ocean County Planning Board and municipal planning boards in Ocean County to take certain measures to control stormwater runoff and nonpoint source pollution in Barnegat Bay watershed. *
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-03-14 | Substituted by S1856 (2R) | |
2011-02-17 | Assembly Floor Amendment Passed (McKeon) | |
2010-09-13 | Reported out of Assembly Comm. with Amendments, 2nd Reading | |
2010-05-06 | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Environment and Solid Waste Committee |
Same As/Similar To
S1856 (Same As) 2011-05-12 - Absolute Veto, Received in the Senate
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2010/A2606 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2606_I1.HTM |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2010/A3000/2606_R1.HTM |