NJ A2657 | 2024-2025 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Over of previous A2080
Note: Carry Over of previous S3716
Note: Carry Over of previous S3716
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 3-0)
Status: Failed on April 4 2024 - 100% progression
Action: 2024-04-04 - Withdrawn from Consideration
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Concerns actions to foreclose right to redeem tax sale certificate under "tax sale law."
Title
Concerns actions to foreclose right to redeem tax sale certificate under "tax sale law."
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-04-04 | Assembly | Withdrawn from Consideration |
2024-01-09 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2080 (Carry Over) 2022-02-07 - Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
S3716 (Carry Over) 2023-03-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
S3716 (Carry Over) 2023-03-13 - Introduced in the Senate, Referred to Senate Community and Urban Affairs Committee
Subjects
New Jersey State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://www.njleg.state.nj.us/bill-search/2024/A2657 |
Text | https://pub.njleg.gov/Bills/2024/A3000/2657_I1.HTM |