NJ A2760 | 2022-2023 | Regular Session
Note: Carry Foward to future A876
Note: Carry Foward to future S2345
Note: Carry Over of previous S3038
Note: Carry Foward to future S2345
Note: Carry Over of previous S3038
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Status: Introduced on February 28 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
Pending: Assembly Appropriations Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [HTML]
Summary
Consolidates certain affordable housing and assistance applications.
Title
Consolidates certain affordable housing and assistance applications.
Sponsors
Rep. Verlina Reynolds-Jackson [D] | Rep. Benjie Wimberly [D] | Sen. Angela Mcknight [D] | Rep. Reginald Atkins [D] |
Roll Calls
2023-02-13 - Assembly - Assembly Housing and Community Development Committee: Reported Favorably (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-02-13 | Assembly | Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee |
2022-02-28 | Assembly | Introduced, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee |
Same As/Similar To
A2760 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
A2760 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S858 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3038 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee
A2760 (Carry Over) 2023-02-13 - Reported and Referred to Assembly Appropriations Committee
S858 (Same As) 2022-12-01 - Reported from Senate Committee with Amendments, 2nd Reading
S3038 (Carry Over) 2021-06-09 - Received in the Assembly, Referred to Assembly Housing Committee